|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
36 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
592,310 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
17,587,402 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
0.61% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Downes Laurence M |
Director |
2018-05-31 |
8,235 |
|
0 |
Powell Frances R |
Director |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
|
0 |
Grinney Jay |
Director |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
|
0 |
Hargett William G |
Director |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
|
0 |
Kleier Alan A |
Director |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
|
0 |
Gorrie Magnus James |
Director |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
|
0 |
Luthy Wallace L |
Director |
2005-04-29 |
86,406 |
2003-06-30 |
0 |
Davis J Mason Jr |
Director |
2008-04-02 |
20,832 |
2004-06-30 |
0 |
Banton Julian W |
Director |
2013-01-23 |
28,602 |
2004-06-30 |
0 |
Ban Stephen D |
Director |
2013-03-28 |
26,654 |
2004-01-28 |
0 |
Wilson David W |
Director |
2013-05-31 |
14,019 |
2004-03-15 |
0 |
Merritt Judy M |
Director |
2014-09-03 |
22,293 |
2004-01-28 |
0 |
Snider Stephen A |
Director |
2017-01-31 |
41,933 |
2004-06-30 |
0 |
Goodrich T Michael |
Director |
2017-01-31 |
47,572 |
2004-06-30 |
0 |
Molen John K |
VP, Gen Counsel and Secretary |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
2018-02-07 |
0 |
Cohen Jonathan Z |
Director |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
2018-03-09 |
0 |
Intrieri Vincent J |
Director |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
Godsey David A |
Subsidiarys SVP - Expl & Geo |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
Lancaster Lori A |
Director |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
2017-12-22 |
0 |
Richardson John S |
President of Subsidiary |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
Mcmanus J T |
Chairman and CEO, Director |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
Lynch Russell E. Jr. |
VP and Controller |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
2018-08-24 |
0 |
Richards Davis E |
Subsidiarys SVP-Operations |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
Dewey Kenneth W. |
Director |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
Porter Charles W |
Vice President, CFO |
2018-11-29 |
0 |
2018-11-29 |
134 |
Minor David J |
Subsidiarys former SVP - Oper |
2016-01-25 |
11,407 |
2016-01-25 |
219 |
Warren William Michael Jr |
and Retired Officer, Director |
2010-04-30 |
38,054 |
2010-04-30 |
615 |
Ketcham G C |
Executive Vice President, CFO |
2006-12-29 |
433 |
2006-12-29 |
1,343 |
Youngblood Gary C |
and Retired Officer, Director |
2016-01-29 |
46,141 |
2016-01-29 |
1,381 |
Carr Grace B |
Vice President and Controller |
2008-02-29 |
17,885 |
2008-02-29 |
3,713 |
Sparks Daniel Paul |
Subs fmr SVP-Resource Dev |
2016-01-25 |
8,602 |
2016-01-25 |
8,497 |
Woodruff J David Jr |
General Counsel and Secretary |
2017-11-10 |
101,465 |
2017-11-10 |
20,021 |
Reynolds D C |
President of Subsidiary |
2014-08-29 |
51,197 |
2014-08-29 |
27,623 |
French Jsm |
Director |
2011-03-24 |
20,580 |
2011-03-24 |
147,000 |
Icahn Partners Master Fund Lp |
10% Owner |
2018-06-19 |
0 |
2018-08-15 |
7,666,382 |
Meister Keith |
Potential Group Member |
|
0 |
2018-02-09 |
9,710,474 |
|