|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
44 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
2,177,482 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
1,201,613 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
11.41% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Magnum Hunter Resources Corp |
10% Owner |
2013-09-10 |
0 |
|
0 |
Burnett Richard Alan |
Former Director |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
|
0 |
Rye Joe T |
Mr.Rye resigned 5/04 |
2004-05-19 |
12,145 |
2003-08-29 |
0 |
Wright Dana G |
VP and Controller |
2004-05-25 |
0 |
2004-05-25 |
0 |
Gibbs H Jarrell |
Director |
2005-02-15 |
6,400 |
2003-06-30 |
0 |
Miller Merrill A Jr |
Director |
2007-01-10 |
1,225 |
2007-01-10 |
0 |
Averett Joe N Jr |
Director |
2007-05-08 |
5,016 |
2005-02-25 |
0 |
Shea William H Jr |
Director |
2007-11-29 |
5,000 |
2007-11-29 |
0 |
Van Marcke De Lummen Philippe |
Director |
2013-06-30 |
57,937 |
2012-03-31 |
0 |
Cloues Edward B Ii |
Director |
2013-12-31 |
76,632 |
2004-05-04 |
0 |
Wright Gary K |
Director |
2015-01-02 |
1,776 |
2003-05-06 |
0 |
Clarke John U |
Director |
2015-09-30 |
131,837 |
2010-02-18 |
0 |
Krablin Steven W |
Director |
2015-09-30 |
113,604 |
2005-05-12 |
0 |
Mccarthy Marc T |
Director |
2016-12-19 |
8,343 |
2016-12-19 |
0 |
Quarls Harry |
Executive Chairman, Director |
2017-11-30 |
43,227 |
2016-12-19 |
0 |
Hartman Steven A. |
SVP & CFO |
2019-09-13 |
12,157 |
2016-09-12 |
0 |
Pottow Victor Frank |
Director |
2020-03-19 |
7,048 |
2018-09-10 |
0 |
Mathis Benjamin |
SVP-Operations & Engineering |
2020-03-19 |
30,438 |
2018-07-24 |
0 |
Schuyler Jerry R |
Director |
2020-03-19 |
13,493 |
2016-12-19 |
0 |
August Nathaniel H. |
|
2020-06-08 |
1,132,251 |
2018-11-26 |
0 |
Holderness Darin G |
Director |
2021-03-02 |
21,640 |
2016-12-19 |
0 |
Hinkle Tammy |
Vice President and Controller |
2021-03-31 |
10,954 |
2017-01-26 |
0 |
Wojahn Jeff E |
Former Director |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
2019-09-03 |
0 |
Geiser Edward |
Former Director and 10% Owner |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
Gwaltney Julia |
Former SVP, COO |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
2021-01-11 |
0 |
Thom Tiffany J |
Former Director |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
2019-09-03 |
0 |
Juniper Capital Iii Gp, L.p. |
Former 10% Owner |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
Henke Darrin J. |
Former President and CEO |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
2020-08-26 |
0 |
Juniper Capital Ii Gp, L.p. |
Former 10% Owner |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
Kelley Russell T Jr |
Former SVP, CFO and Treasurer |
2023-06-20 |
0 |
2019-12-20 |
0 |
Mcnair Forrest W |
VP and Controller |
2008-08-13 |
2,402 |
2008-08-13 |
150 |
Sonnen Joan C |
VP & Controller |
2014-08-04 |
26,000 |
2014-08-04 |
541 |
Stamper Michael E |
Officer |
2011-12-08 |
3,910 |
2011-12-08 |
1,987 |
Brooks John A |
President and CEO, Director |
2020-03-03 |
33,488 |
2016-05-18 |
2,326 |
Page Ronald K |
Vice President |
2007-11-05 |
0 |
2008-03-19 |
3,829 |
Pici Frank A |
Exec. VP and CFO |
2010-02-25 |
18,613 |
2008-02-22 |
3,990 |
Whitehead H Baird |
President & CEO, Director |
2015-05-06 |
195,514 |
2015-05-06 |
12,901 |
Garrett Robert |
Director |
2012-05-04 |
41,695 |
2012-05-04 |
14,815 |
Snyder Nancy M |
EVP, CAO & General Counsel |
2016-09-12 |
0 |
2015-05-06 |
21,739 |
Horton Keith D |
Executive VP, Director |
2007-11-09 |
0 |
2008-08-27 |
42,278 |
Dearlove A James |
CEO, Director |
2011-02-25 |
96,656 |
2011-02-25 |
89,433 |
Perelman Marsha Reines |
Director |
2015-09-30 |
68,081 |
2015-09-30 |
123,214 |
Khosla Victor |
10% Owner |
|
0 |
2020-02-07 |
178,993 |
Kls Diversified Asset Management Lp |
Director |
2018-05-14 |
0 |
2018-05-23 |
705,417 |
|