|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
58 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
20,464,585 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
1,854,963 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
3.9% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Armstrong Ronald E |
Chief Executive Officer, Director |
2019-06-28 |
274,376 |
2003-07-02 |
0 |
Feight R Preston |
CHIEF EXECUTIVE OFFICER, Director |
2024-09-05 |
162,782 |
2024-09-05 |
16,361 |
Luiz Kaufmann |
Director |
|
0 |
2012-07-01 |
5,000 |
Grinstein Gerald |
Director |
2005-01-03 |
12,491 |
2004-01-02 |
0 |
Stonecipher Harry C |
Director |
2005-03-15 |
11,596 |
2003-07-08 |
0 |
Newbigging David K |
Director |
2006-01-03 |
4,771 |
2004-04-27 |
0 |
Wagner Harold A |
Director |
2008-01-02 |
24,638 |
2003-07-08 |
0 |
Pigott James Calvin |
Director |
2009-01-30 |
10,777,936 |
2009-01-30 |
63,675 |
Fluke John M Jr |
Director |
2010-10-29 |
25,315 |
2003-03-06 |
0 |
Reed William Jr |
Director |
2011-01-03 |
683,963 |
2011-01-03 |
2,571 |
Page Stephen F |
Director |
2012-04-24 |
33,819 |
2004-09-21 |
0 |
Parry Robert T |
Director |
2012-04-24 |
11,317 |
2004-12-07 |
0 |
Plimpton Thomas E |
Director |
2012-09-13 |
135,557 |
2003-07-31 |
0 |
Staley Warren R |
Director |
2013-01-02 |
12,399 |
2008-12-09 |
0 |
Ford Beth |
Director |
2015-04-21 |
1,462 |
2015-04-21 |
0 |
Schulz Mark A |
Director |
2018-01-02 |
8,971 |
2012-04-24 |
0 |
Williamson Charles R |
Director |
2021-01-04 |
33,333 |
2006-07-03 |
0 |
Carnwath Alison J |
Director |
2022-01-28 |
0 |
2005-10-03 |
0 |
Niekamp Cynthia |
Director |
2023-04-25 |
144 |
|
0 |
Pigott John |
Director |
2023-12-21 |
2,283,953 |
2023-12-22 |
1,079,416 |
Hill Brice |
Director |
2024-07-01 |
811 |
2024-07-01 |
0 |
Breber Pierre R |
Director |
2024-07-01 |
8,015 |
|
0 |
Feder Franklin |
Director |
2024-08-30 |
21,477 |
2024-08-30 |
0 |
Pigott Mark C |
Executive Chairman, Director |
2024-09-05 |
4,843,277 |
2024-09-05 |
590,033 |
Sobic Daniel D |
EXECUTIVE VICE PRESIDENT |
2015-12-04 |
67,625 |
|
0 |
Moore Gary Lee |
Executive Vice President |
2020-03-03 |
65,197 |
|
0 |
Dozier C Michael |
EXECUTIVE VICE PRESIDENT |
2024-09-05 |
24,660 |
2024-09-05 |
18,923 |
Siver Darrin C |
EXECUTIVE VICE PRESIDENT |
2024-09-05 |
56,526 |
2024-09-05 |
23,437 |
Christensen Robert J. |
President & CFO |
2017-01-06 |
75,976 |
|
0 |
Schippers Harrie |
PRESIDENT & CFO |
2024-09-05 |
105,558 |
2024-09-05 |
2,898 |
Tembreull Michael A |
Reporting person retired |
2009-02-06 |
249,944 |
2003-07-02 |
0 |
Cardillo James G |
RETIRED PRESIDENT |
2011-01-13 |
59,058 |
2004-07-08 |
0 |
Panza Nicholas P |
SENIOR VICE PRESIDENT |
2004-04-08 |
20,049 |
|
0 |
Bengston Robert A. |
Senior Vice President |
2019-02-01 |
44,547 |
|
0 |
Baney Kevin D |
Senior Vice President |
2024-09-05 |
7,121 |
2024-09-05 |
5,398 |
Quinn T. Kyle |
SR. V.P. & CHIEF TECH. OFFICER |
2021-06-02 |
28,720 |
2021-06-02 |
7,810 |
Barkley Michael T |
SR. VICE PRESIDENT/CONTROLLER |
2023-05-03 |
84,061 |
2023-05-03 |
9 |
Rich John N |
V.P. & CHIEF TECH. OFFICER |
2024-09-05 |
2,425 |
2024-09-05 |
951 |
Hovind David J |
VICE CHAIRMAN, Director |
2003-10-29 |
31,074 |
2003-10-29 |
0 |
Flynn Patrick F |
VICE PRESIDENT |
2004-07-28 |
2,022 |
2003-07-02 |
0 |
Goudriaan Aad L. |
Vice President |
2009-02-23 |
19,147 |
|
0 |
Means Samuel M. Iii |
Vice President |
2015-06-05 |
14,805 |
2011-04-25 |
0 |
Wolters Henricus M. B. |
VICE PRESIDENT |
2020-03-01 |
686 |
|
0 |
Davila Marco A. |
Vice President |
2020-06-02 |
9,839 |
|
0 |
Danforth David J |
VICE PRESIDENT |
2020-07-24 |
8,076 |
2018-06-05 |
0 |
Skoog Jason P |
VICE PRESIDENT |
2020-07-24 |
5,172 |
2018-06-05 |
0 |
Ley Alma Lily |
Vice President |
2020-07-30 |
4,152 |
2020-07-30 |
141 |
Levier Jack K. |
Vice President |
2022-06-01 |
22,725 |
2022-06-01 |
8,148 |
Bolgar Paulo Henrique |
Vice President |
2024-09-05 |
2,287 |
2024-09-05 |
564 |
Hubbard Todd R |
VICE PRESIDENT |
2024-09-05 |
6,291 |
2024-09-05 |
6,404 |
Skredsvig Janice B |
VICE PRESIDENT & CIO |
2008-09-01 |
5,856 |
2005-04-07 |
0 |
Poplawski Brice J |
Vice President & Controller |
2024-05-10 |
0 |
2024-09-05 |
17,052 |
Gangl Kenneth R |
VICE PRESIDENT & TREASURER |
2008-01-11 |
23,066 |
2003-07-02 |
0 |
Clack James D |
VICE PRESIDENT/GENERAL COUNSEL |
2017-03-07 |
726 |
|
0 |
Anderson David C |
Vice President/General Counsel |
2017-12-05 |
5,284 |
2006-01-09 |
0 |
Grandstaff Douglas S |
VICE PRESIDENT/GENERAL COUNSEL |
2020-06-02 |
7,557 |
2020-06-02 |
21 |
Walton Michael K |
VICE PRESIDENT/GENERAL COUNSEL |
2024-09-05 |
130 |
2024-09-05 |
6,151 |
Morie Gordon Glen |
VP & GENERAL COUNSEL |
2005-01-10 |
31,820 |
2003-07-02 |
0 |
|