|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
39 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
1,267,585 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
129,992 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
2.96% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Teske Todd J |
President, CEO & Treasurer, Director |
2020-10-23 |
227,200 |
2020-10-23 |
0 |
Reitman William H |
SVP Sales - Americas T&C Prod |
2020-08-21 |
28,076 |
2020-08-21 |
49,147 |
Carpenter Randall R |
VP Communications |
2020-08-21 |
50,725 |
2020-08-21 |
172 |
Rodgers David J |
SVP Corp Dev & Pres - Job Site |
2020-08-21 |
130,962 |
2020-08-21 |
253 |
Zeiler Jeffrey Michael |
SVP Innovation & Technology |
2020-08-21 |
89,810 |
2020-08-21 |
15,112 |
Redman Harold L |
SVP & Pres. Turf & Cons. Prod. |
2020-08-21 |
96,161 |
2020-08-21 |
278 |
Debaets David G |
VP Operations-Engines & Power |
2018-08-20 |
19,183 |
2018-08-20 |
3,508 |
Kampling Patricia L |
Director |
2019-08-19 |
10,568 |
2017-08-21 |
0 |
Wright Joseph C |
Sr VP & President-Engines Gr |
2015-08-17 |
60,275 |
2015-08-17 |
2,577 |
Buono Kathryn Mary |
VP, Corp. Counsel & Secy |
2020-08-21 |
60,646 |
2015-04-29 |
0 |
Jaehnert Frank M |
Director |
2019-08-30 |
70,479 |
2015-01-28 |
0 |
Heath Robert F |
VP, Gen. Counsel & Secr. |
2014-11-14 |
14,533 |
2014-11-14 |
1,834 |
Savage Thomas R |
Senior Vice President |
2014-02-25 |
37,435 |
2014-02-25 |
4,375 |
Slipsager Henrik C |
Director |
2020-12-22 |
0 |
2013-11-08 |
0 |
Shiely Vincent R |
Former Sr. VP |
2010-11-16 |
43,540 |
2010-11-16 |
8,337 |
Twinem Carita R |
Treasurer |
2010-08-17 |
22,270 |
2010-08-17 |
4,682 |
Brenn James E |
Sr. Vice President |
2010-08-16 |
24,355 |
2010-08-16 |
10,873 |
Shiely John S |
Chairman, Director |
2010-08-16 |
15,240 |
2010-08-16 |
8,541 |
Mcloughlin Keith R |
Director |
2016-08-26 |
4,787 |
2007-08-14 |
0 |
Schoen Michael D |
Sr. VP & President Int Power |
2007-02-28 |
0 |
2007-02-28 |
5,761 |
Thompson George R |
VP-Corp. Communications & Comm |
2007-01-05 |
3,785 |
2007-01-05 |
126 |
Neylon Paul M |
Sr. VP - Operations |
2006-10-24 |
30,963 |
2006-10-24 |
9,156 |
Baker Jay H |
Director |
2006-08-15 |
3,000 |
2006-08-15 |
3,800 |
Dillon Ricky T |
Controller |
2005-08-16 |
2,772 |
2005-08-16 |
452 |
Rugg Stephen H |
Retired Officer |
2005-08-24 |
1,000 |
2005-05-10 |
0 |
Bush Mary K |
Director |
2009-04-29 |
0 |
2004-11-01 |
0 |
Burner David L |
Director |
2007-08-14 |
3,200 |
2003-11-01 |
0 |
Achtmeyer William F |
Director |
2007-08-14 |
2,097 |
2003-11-01 |
0 |
Walker Brian C |
Director |
2020-12-24 |
0 |
2003-11-01 |
0 |
Hazeltine Mark R |
Vice Pres. & Sales Mgr. |
2003-08-13 |
0 |
2003-09-02 |
1,008 |
Batten Michael E |
Director |
2007-08-14 |
6,175 |
2003-08-26 |
0 |
Filter E Margie |
Director |
2004-01-02 |
2,248 |
2003-08-14 |
0 |
O Toole Robert J |
Director |
2007-08-14 |
5,600 |
2003-08-13 |
0 |
Story Charles I |
Director |
2015-10-01 |
12,407 |
2003-08-12 |
0 |
Humphrey James E |
|
|
0 |
|
0 |
Wajda Edward J Ii |
SVP & Pres-Stdby/Job Site |
2016-08-31 |
30,545 |
|
0 |
Schwertfeger Mark A. |
SVP & Chief Financial Officer |
2020-08-21 |
79,181 |
|
0 |
Lehr Rachele Marie |
SVP Corp Sys & Human Capital |
2020-08-21 |
49,260 |
|
0 |
Golvach Andrea L |
VP & Treasurer |
2020-08-21 |
29,107 |
|
0 |
|