|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
39 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
738,984 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
56,667 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
2.28% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Richardson Paul H |
VP, R&D |
2011-05-09 |
28,188 |
2006-11-20 |
0 |
Miniger Robert T |
VP Human Resources |
2008-05-13 |
0 |
2003-12-31 |
0 |
Samuels Winston A |
Vice President/GM Encapsulates |
2004-01-29 |
51,000 |
2004-01-29 |
0 |
Siuta Cruce Patricia |
Vice President Technology |
2004-01-07 |
32,025 |
2004-01-07 |
0 |
Fitzpatrick Frank |
Vice President |
2017-02-21 |
68,726 |
2003-12-31 |
1,980 |
Putnam Dana E. |
V P & General Manger |
2013-06-06 |
44,716 |
2012-06-14 |
4,645 |
Rossi Dino A |
Retired Director |
2017-01-03 |
25,068 |
2016-05-13 |
31,000 |
Houston Matthew David |
General Counsel/Secretary |
2016-09-20 |
20,050 |
2006-02-27 |
0 |
Mcdermott Francis X |
Director |
2004-10-05 |
17,256 |
2004-09-30 |
0 |
Ammidon Hoyt Jr |
Director |
2008-03-20 |
0 |
2003-08-20 |
0 |
Mitchell Kenneth P |
Director |
2009-12-08 |
51,366 |
2003-08-06 |
0 |
Wedral Elaine R |
Director |
2013-12-18 |
29,697 |
2006-12-08 |
0 |
Bendure Richard Allen |
Chief Operating Officer |
2014-02-26 |
21,218 |
|
0 |
Mcmillan Edward |
|
2018-06-20 |
24,495 |
2003-04-11 |
0 |
Coelho Mary Theresa |
|
2018-10-29 |
2,105 |
2018-02-15 |
0 |
Ludwig David F |
|
2019-11-12 |
18,775 |
2018-05-10 |
17,910 |
Mason Scott C |
|
2020-11-13 |
9,675 |
|
0 |
Coombs Paul D |
|
2021-02-11 |
22,540 |
2010-12-07 |
0 |
Hyde James C |
|
2022-02-15 |
15,915 |
|
0 |
Stach Mark A |
|
2022-02-15 |
7,763 |
2019-02-13 |
0 |
Premdas Perry W |
|
2023-02-08 |
51,008 |
2008-01-02 |
0 |
Televantos John Y |
|
2023-02-13 |
29,078 |
2005-12-30 |
0 |
Boned Frederic |
|
2024-02-08 |
5,322 |
|
0 |
Rigaud Olivier |
|
2024-02-08 |
540 |
2024-02-08 |
0 |
Lee Joyce J. |
|
2024-02-08 |
2,776 |
2020-02-13 |
0 |
Vicente Monica |
|
2024-02-08 |
540 |
2024-02-08 |
0 |
Knutson Daniel E |
|
2024-02-08 |
5,049 |
2018-02-15 |
0 |
Fish Kathleen B |
|
2024-02-08 |
1,579 |
2022-02-10 |
0 |
Reid Martin Luther |
|
2024-02-11 |
6,505 |
2023-02-08 |
0 |
Bengtsson Carl Martin |
|
2024-02-11 |
19,746 |
2019-02-13 |
0 |
Griffin Jonathan Harrison |
|
2024-02-11 |
12,737 |
2023-02-08 |
0 |
Harris Theodore L |
|
2024-02-22 |
66,412 |
|
0 |
Wineinger Matthew David |
|
2024-03-04 |
6,162 |
2016-02-23 |
0 |
Tignor Michael Brent |
|
2024-03-08 |
8,368 |
2023-02-08 |
0 |
Fischer David B |
|
2024-05-08 |
9,009 |
2010-09-16 |
1,000 |
Sestrick Michael Robert |
|
2024-05-10 |
4,878 |
2023-02-08 |
0 |
Miyata Hatsuki |
|
2024-07-27 |
5,169 |
|
0 |
Backus William A. |
|
2024-07-30 |
4,988 |
2024-07-30 |
132 |
Van Gunsteren Job Leonard |
|
2024-07-31 |
8,540 |
2022-08-03 |
0 |
|