|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
26 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
92,517 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
76,024,316 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
0% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Mouquin Charles H |
Director |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
Anderson Donna L |
Controller |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2005-08-24 |
0 |
Zeidman Fred S |
Chairman of the BOD, Director |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2004-07-21 |
0 |
Monson Robert D |
CEO and President, Director |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2004-12-15 |
0 |
Callaghan Kevin P |
COO, Executive Vice President |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2004-07-02 |
0 |
Black C Robert |
Director |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2004-07-21 |
0 |
Restrepo William J |
Exec VP, CFO |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2005-07-25 |
0 |
Holmes Ned S |
Director |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2004-07-21 |
0 |
Flannery Kevin S |
Director |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
|
0 |
Simon Robert J Ii |
President, Seitel Data Ltd. |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2004-07-02 |
0 |
Smith Garis C |
President, Olympic Seismic |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
|
0 |
Golding Jay H |
Director |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
|
0 |
Spivy Gregory P |
Director |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2006-04-21 |
0 |
Ubben Jeffrey W |
10% Owner |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
Kendrick Marcia H |
Senior Vice President, CAO |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
2007-02-14 |
0 |
Williams J D |
Director |
2006-01-03 |
48,821 |
2004-07-21 |
0 |
Kelley Robert |
Former Director |
2005-06-01 |
15,757 |
2004-07-21 |
0 |
Mellon Hbv Co Ltd. |
10% Owner |
2004-11-17 |
0 |
2004-11-22 |
15,606,838 |
Mellon Hbv Alternative Strategies Llc |
10% Owner |
2004-08-02 |
0 |
2006-02-28 |
0 |
Craig Walter M Jr |
Resigned as D and O, 07/02/04 |
2004-07-30 |
6,684 |
2004-07-30 |
0 |
Kamin Peter H |
Director, 10% Owner |
2004-07-19 |
0 |
2006-03-01 |
51,201,346 |
Third Point Offshore Fund, Ltd. |
10% Owner |
2004-07-19 |
0 |
2004-08-02 |
6,860,000 |
Lerner William |
Resigned as Director, 07/02/04 |
2004-07-02 |
9,170 |
2004-07-02 |
0 |
Steiglitz John E |
Resigned as Director, 07/02/04 |
2004-07-02 |
12,085 |
2004-07-02 |
0 |
Stilley Randall D |
President and CEO, Director |
2004-07-02 |
0 |
2004-07-02 |
0 |
Mellon Financial Corp |
10% Owner |
|
0 |
2004-07-02 |
2,356,132 |
|