|
Company
Roster
|
Total
Insiders : |
23 |
|
|
Total
Direct Shares :
|
34,638,769 |
|
Total
Indirect Shares :
|
257,672,812 |
|
%
Held by Insiders:
|
13.63% |
|
|
|
Filer's Name |
Relation |
Direct Date |
Direct Shares |
Indirect Date |
Indirect Shares |
Sharp Michael J. |
EVP, GC and Secretary |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
|
0 |
Shaw John C Jr |
President and COO, Director |
2005-06-30 |
927,982 |
2003-06-30 |
0 |
Syrjamaki Maxine |
Controller - Retired |
2007-09-30 |
103,565 |
2003-06-30 |
0 |
Schenk Joseph A |
Exec. VP |
2007-12-06 |
194,431 |
2003-06-30 |
0 |
Macchiarola Frank J |
Director |
2008-04-28 |
289,788 |
2003-06-30 |
0 |
Jefferies High Yield Holdings, Llc |
10% Owner |
2008-12-03 |
0 |
2008-12-01 |
0 |
Jefferies Group Inc /de/ |
10% Owner |
2008-12-03 |
16,720,110 |
2008-12-01 |
0 |
Feller Lloyd H |
Exec. VP, GC and Secretary |
2010-11-15 |
158,109 |
2003-06-30 |
0 |
Bei Jeffvest, Llc |
10% Owner |
2011-04-08 |
0 |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
O Kane Michael T |
Director |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
2006-05-22 |
0 |
Joyal Robert Eugene |
Director |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
2006-02-10 |
0 |
Broadbent Peregrine C |
CFO |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
2007-11-19 |
0 |
Stacconi John F. |
Global Treasurer |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
Dooley Richard G |
Director |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
2003-06-30 |
0 |
Hendrickson Charles J |
Treasurer |
2011-11-29 |
52,898 |
2007-07-16 |
2,102 |
Friedman Brian P |
Chairman Executive Committee, Director |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
2012-12-26 |
60,000 |
Campbell W Patrick |
Director |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
2012-12-26 |
63,957 |
Handler Richard B |
Chairman and CEO, Director |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
2012-12-28 |
554,739 |
Leucadia National Corp |
10% Owner |
2008-04-23 |
0 |
2008-05-05 |
42,352,196 |
Baldwin Enterprises, Inc. |
10% Owner |
2008-05-06 |
0 |
2010-10-20 |
49,276,385 |
Phlcorp Inc |
10% Owner |
2008-05-06 |
16,191,886 |
2010-11-01 |
49,351,385 |
Steinberg Joseph S |
Director |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
2012-05-07 |
58,006,024 |
Cumming Ian M |
Director |
2013-03-01 |
0 |
2012-12-31 |
58,006,024 |
|